A full list of current vacancies can be found at http://www.jobs.cam.ac.uk.
Churchill Professorship of Mathematics for Operational Research in the Department of Pure Mathematics and Mathematical Statistics; closing date: 15 March 2018; informal enquiries: Professor Gabriel Paternain, Head of the Department of Pure Mathematics and Mathematical Statistics (email: G.P.Paternain@dpmms.cam.ac.uk or tel.: 01223 337995); further details: http://www.jobs.cam.ac.uk/job/16513; quote reference: LF14674
Herchel Smith Professorship of Pure Mathematics in the Department of Pure Mathematics and Mathematical Statistics; closing date: 15 March 2018; informal enquiries: Professor Gabriel Paternain, Head of the Department of Pure Mathematics and Mathematical Statistics (email: G.P.Paternain@dpmms.cam.ac.uk or tel.: 01223 337995); further details: http://www.jobs.cam.ac.uk/job/16514; quote reference: LF14675
The University values diversity and is committed to equality of opportunity.
The University has a responsibility to ensure that all employees are eligible to live and work in the UK.
The following appointments, reappointment, and grants of title have been made:
Oncology. Dr Robert Rintoul, B.Sc., St Andrew’s, M.B.Ch.B., Ph.D., Edinburgh, FRCP, appointed from 1 October 2017 until the retiring age
Land Economy. Dr Heiner Thies Edmund Lindenthal, B.Sc., M.Phil., Ph.D., Maastricht, appointed from 1 February 2018 until the retiring age and subject to a probationary period of five years.
Materials Science and Metallurgy/Physics. Dr Louise Caroline Hirst, B.Sc., M.Sc., Ph.D., London, appointed from 22 January 2018 until the retiring age and subject to a probationary period of five years.
Radiology. Dr Tristan Barrett, M.D., CLH, B.Sc., M.B.B.S., London, MRCP, FRCR, appointed from 1 January 2018 until the retiring age and subject to a probationary period of five years.
Medicine. Dr Marko Nikolic, M.A., M.B.B.Chir., G, Ph.D., K, MRCP, appointed from 1 April 2018 until 31 March 2022 subject to a probationary period of twelve months.
University Offices (Finance Division). Miss Heather Claire Elizabeth Davis, appointed from 1 November 2017 until the retiring age.
University Offices (Estate Management). Mr John Richard Neve, appointed from 1 December 2017 until the retiring age.
University Offices (Research Operations). Dr Joanna Dekkers, W, appointed from 1 January 2018 until the retiring age.
Physics. Mr Jian Yuan, appointed from 2 January 2018 until the retiring age and subject to a probationary period of nine months.
Isaac Newton. Dr Christie May Marr, reappointed from 16 January 2018 until the retiring age.
Chemical Engineering and Biotechnology. Dr Kenneth Bruce Seamon has been granted the title of Affiliated Lecturer from 1 January 2018 until 30 September 2019.
Clinical Medicine. Dr Peter John Campbell has been granted the title of Affiliated Lecturer from 1 April 2018 for a further two years.
History. Dr Gareth William Atkins, Q, has been granted the title of Affiliated Lecturer from 1 October 2017 for a further year. Dr Helen Barbara Elizabeth Roche, ED, and Dr David Anthony Woodman, R, have been granted the title of Affiliated Lecturer from 1 October 2017 for a further two years.
Law. Dr Benjamin Spagnolo, T, has been granted the title of Affiliated Lecturer from 1 October 2017 until 30 September 2018.