The following election, appointments, reappointments, and grants of title have been made:
Professor Raymond Ethan Goldstein, B.Sc., Massachusetts Institute of Technology, M.Sc., Ph.D., Cornell, Professor of Physics and Applied Mathematics, University of Arizona, elected Schlumberger Professor of Complex Physical Systems from 1 September 2006.
Professor Arnoud De Meyer, M.Sc., Ph.D., Ghent, appointed Professor of Management Studies and Director of Judge Business School, with effect from 1 September 2006.
Veterinary Medicine. Dr Karla Chui Luan Lee, Vet.M.B., M.A., SE, MRCVS, appointed from 1 September 2006 until the retiring age.
Physiology, Development, and Neuroscience. Professor Graham James Burton, JN, appointed from 17 January 2006 to 17 March 2006.
University Offices (Academic Division). Mrs Nicola Riley, B.A., Surrey, appointed Administrative Officer, Grade II, from 1 March 2006 until the retiring age, with duties in the School of Clinical Medicine.
University Offices (Secretariat). Mrs Rachel Sophie Hill, B.A., East Anglia, appointed Administrative Officer, Grade II, from 1 March 2006 until the retiring age. Ms Emma Reiko Easterbrook, M.A., TH, appointed part-time Administrative Officer, Grade II, from 6 February 2006 until the retiring age.
University Offices (Management Information Services Division). Mrs Rachel Mary Coleman Finch, M.A., NH, appointed Computer Officer, Grade I, from 1 January 2006 until the retiring age.
Economics. Dr Christopher Michael Meissner, K, reappointed from 1 October 2006 until the retiring age.
Law. Dr Guglielmo Verdirame, CC, reappointed from 1 September 2006 until the retiring age.
Law. Ms Amy Catherine Goymour, F, and Dr Janet Clare Louise Jackson, TH, have been granted the title of Affiliated Lecturer from 1 October 2005 for two years.
Social and Political Sciences. Dr Lawrence Hamilton, CLH, has been granted the title of Affiliated Lecturer from 1 October 2005 for two years.